Financial history THE BRYAN ADAMS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £301.03k £107.27k £144.06k £280.38k £84.40k
Total expenditure £306.30k £30.99k £113.04k £180.47k £283.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A