Financial history DEYSBROOK VILLAGE CENTRE

Charity number: 1119053
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.41k £90.40k £142.97k £141.46k £162.19k
Total expenditure £58.93k £77.58k £124.19k £132.75k £181.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £10.00k £53.98k £23.81k £9.50k