Accounts and annual returns BLACK DIAMOND TRUST

Charity number: 1117895
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 July 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 July 2015 05 July 2016 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2014 26 September 2015 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2014 Not Required