BLACK DIAMOND TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's charity that aims to assist grass-root NGU's in developing countries in the provision of sustainable education and healthcare of children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- Nigeria
- Zambia
Governance
- 08 February 2007: Standard registration
- 11 April 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2011 | 30/07/2012 | 30/07/2013 | 30/07/2014 | 30/07/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £450 | £130 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £212 | £150 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2015 | 05 July 2016 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2014 | 26 September 2015 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITHIN THE DESIGNATED GEOGRAPHICAL LOCATIONS (DEVELOPING COUNTRIES) BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES. 2.TO AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITHIN THE DESIGNATED GEOGRAPHICAL LOCATIONS (DEVELOPING COUNTRIES) BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACADEMIC SPONSORSHIP AND SUPPLYING EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window