CHILDREN'S EARLY INTERVENTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. to disseminate research evidence on effective strategies and the availability of training in such programmes 2. to obtain resources to establish research into effective interventions 3. to act as a resource signposting parents, teachers and children to statutory and voluntary organisations that deliver effective services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 12 July 2007: Standard registration
- INCREDIBLE YEARS CYMRU (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hefin Francis | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Anthony Woods | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nia Alanna MacCallum-Roberts | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alon Williams | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Pam Martin-Forbes | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nia Heledd Hall | Trustee | 05 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr NIA GRIFFITH | Trustee | 29 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Professor TRACEY BYWATER | Trustee | 16 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.51k | £53.35k | £42.73k | £63.58k | £73.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.92k | £38.74k | £33.35k | £30.56k | £69.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.28k | £6.45k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF EVIDENCE BASED INTERVENTION PROGRAMMES WITHIN FAMILIES, SCHOOLS AND OTHER SOCIAL GROUPS TO PREVENT OR REDUCE VIOLENCE AND TO DEVELOP CHILDREN'S SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL COMPETENCE; AND TO PROMOTE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH INTO EVIDENCE BASED INTERVENTION PROGRAMMES AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS THEROF
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Children's Early Intervention Trust
Nantlle Building
Normal Site
Bangor university
BANGOR
Gwynedd
- Phone:
- 01248383758
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window