Financial history LONDON COMMUNITY RESOURCE NETWORK

Charity number: 1118616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £133.12k £124.31k £23.67k £0 £135
Total expenditure £123.74k £122.13k £17.20k £335 £219
Income from government contracts £131.32k £47.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A