FRIENDS OF SUNERA FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Sunera Foundation (FSF) supports the work of Sunera Foundation (SF) in Sri Lanka by creating a steady and reliable source of funds. Donors in Britain are given the opportunity to learn more about SF's work, to make one-off or regular donations, and to raise funds themselves. We are also interested in helping people here with relevant skills and talents to work with SF in Sri Lanka.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 2007: Standard registration
- 22 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.59k | £18.34k | £29.73k | £20.53k | £24.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.01k | £16.17k | £29.60k | £19.39k | £1.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 19 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 02 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 09 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 09 March 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 06 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF SRI LANKANS WHO ARE DISABLED, SUFFERING FROM TRAUMA OR DISADVANTAGED OR MARGINALISED BY THEIR SOCIETY BY SUPPORTING THE ACTIVITIES OF SUNERA FOUNDATION, SRI LANKA WHICH ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window