Accounts and annual returns PILGRIM BM45 TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1118004
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 January 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 12 January 2018 07 January 2019 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2018 07 January 2019 56 days late
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required