NXT MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Local churches in worship areas for example music, multimedia, format. We offer guidance on different styles of worship and give practical help as well as encouragement. We also organise events i.e music events and conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH ROBINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PETER HERBERT | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev ASHLEY ROBERT COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT LAWTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.50k | £34.00k | £41.60k | £31.50k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.20k | £16.00k | £24.15k | £14.20k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 July 2023 | 520 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 July 2023 | 885 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1574 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 DECEMBER 2006..
Charitable objects
2.1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY: 2.1.1) THE PROMOTION OF THE RENEWAL AND REVIVAL OF THE WORK, WORSHIP AND WITNESS OF THE CHURCH, THROUGH THE PRODUCTION OF QUALITY RESOURCES FOR LOCAL CHURCHES TO USE IN MISSION AND OUTREACH. 2.1.2) TO NURTURE THE GIFTS AND SKILLS OF INDIVIDUALS AND MAKE THEM AVAILABLE TO THE WIDER CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY. 2.1.3) TO PROVIDE TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES IN WORSHIP AND EVANGELISM. 2.1.4) TO ORGANISE REGIONAL AND NATIONAL EVENTS TO SUPPORT LOCAL CHURCHES IN MISSION AND/OR WORSHIP. 2.1.5) TO PROVIDE REGIONAL AND NATIONAL EVANGELISTIC EVENTS. 2.1.6) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO HELP THE LOCAL CHURCHES ENGAGE WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY. 2.1.7) THE PROMOTION OF MATURE CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALITY IN THE LIVES OF ALL MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH. 2.1.8) THE PROMOTION OF JOINT ACTION WITH EVANGELICAL CHRISTIANS IN ALL DENOMINATIONS OF THE CHURCH IN LOCAL AND NATIONAL EVENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 SWAN SQUARE
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST6 2AA
- Phone:
- 01782575129
- Email:
- info@nxt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window