Financial history THE DUXFORD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1117969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.91k £881 £752 £1.18k £1.00k
Total expenditure £1.64k £145 £841 £1.18k £1.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A