THE SURREY CRICKET BOARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for the playing of and development of cricket and other sports capable of improving health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income:
£2,192,317
Donations and legacies | £1.54m | |
Charitable activities | £577.51k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £72.93k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,171,226
Raising funds | £77.38k | |
Charitable activities | £2.09m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £77.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.09m | |
Retained for future use | £21.09k |
People

64 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
- Southwark
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 April 2007: Standard registration
- SURREY CRICKET FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Potter Marmol | Chair | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas McAllister | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Rachel Walker | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dunstan Dennis Holder | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rawle Emerson Beckles | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Pierce | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arun Harinath | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Crispin Lyden-Cowan | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Nigel Martyn | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lewendon | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Patrick Keaton | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Sophia Aemilia Alison Kent | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.05m | £1.14m | £1.70m | £2.08m | £2.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £960.14k | £1.12m | £1.63m | £1.85m | £2.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £822.53k | £858.33k | £1.17m | £96.73k | £1.54m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £230.90k | £266.19k | £524.80k | £594.97k | £577.51k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £26.33k | £72.93k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.36m | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £30.91k | £22.74k | £65.85k | £96.73k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £959.92k | £1.08m | £1.57m | £1.76m | £2.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £220 | £36.49k | £59.39k | £84.25k | £77.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.60k | £9.60k | £9.60k | £9.60k | £9.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £32.74k | £0 | £0 | £62.15k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.19m | £1.20m | £1.29m | £1.47m | £1.48m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £356.27k | £340.97k | £368.63k | £317.62k | £307.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF AND DEVELOPMENT OF CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ('FACILITIES' IN THIS CLAUSE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE GAME OF CRICKET AND OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS ON A RECREATIONAL BASIS FOR THE LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY; AND 3.4 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Surrey County Cricket Club Ltd
The Kia Oval
Kennington Oval
London
SE11 5SS
- Phone:
- 02078205637
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window