PIONEER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- France
- Ghana
- Guinea
- India
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Liberia
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Pakistan
- Scotland
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 11 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Mark Clifford | Chair | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gregory George | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard White | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Joanna Rachel Musgrove | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.57k | £237.33k | £231.28k | £284.32k | £368.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.38k | £189.59k | £230.01k | £290.87k | £405.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 MARCH 2007 AND 03 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Peter's Centre
Storer Road
Loughborough
LE11 5EQ
- Phone:
- 08452 410 020
- Email:
- admin@pioneer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window