Financial history HASSANALI & JENNABAI VISRAM FOUNDATION (AKA H & J VISRAM FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1117983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £228.63k £166.11k £158.31k £68.15k £75.19k
Total expenditure £98.21k £94.45k £125.87k £109.11k £85.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A