NEW PARKS PLAY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides "open access" supervised play facility known as New Parks Adventure Playground set on parkland. Open year round for out of school activities,holiday playschemes and school visits. Age range 5 - 14 years, all children must register. Free at the point of entry,registered with Ofsted No EY358325 and operating on this site since 1979.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,084 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 26 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN HEATHER LAYWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN DAVID BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIM LORETT NORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.79k | £183.53k | £139.49k | £142.80k | £160.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.45k | £162.76k | £156.60k | £140.19k | £152.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.11k | £3.51k | £121.20k | £26.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 284 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 284 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 9 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE NEW PARKS AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE CHILDREN WHO HAVE NEED DUE TO THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Scott Street
LEICESTER
LE2 6DW
- Phone:
- 07715603882
- Email:
- newparks-thevenny@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window