MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL AND FINANCIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds educational and medical projects and equipment in South Africa. This year £561.78 GBP was used to fund a Personal Address system for a secondary school in rural KwaZulu-Natal (in the sub-Hlabisa district). A remaining £4923.17 was carried forward to the next financial year, to fund new classrooms/school hall - an ongoing project for which money is being raised.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Africa
Governance
- 11 April 2007: Standard registration
- MEDFIT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER PERCIVAL BLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr IAN CRAIGIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR RUTH BLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52k | £50 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £525 | £5.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 March 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTARY TRUST DEED DATED 24 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN AFRICA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY AND/OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR PERSONS WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THEM THROUGH LACK OF MEANS; 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN AFRICA IN ANY SUBJECT(S) WORTHY OF STUDY PROVIDING THE OBJECT IS NOT PRIMARILY TO PROMOTE A SINGLE POINT OF VIEW; AND 3.3 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR MEDICAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Knowes
Auchans Road
Houston
Johnstone
PA6 7EF
- Phone:
- 01505323528
- Email:
- medfit.charity@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window