WELWYN HATFIELD ISLAMIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of religion of Islam and organising and running charitable events within the local community Welwyn Garden City and Hatfiled. Islamic Education for the young within the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 March 2008: Standard registration
- 26 February 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1155040 WELWYN ISLAMIC SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.69k | £19.52k | £21.23k | £29.74k | £31.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.65k | £11.01k | £11.21k | £11.82k | £10.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 05 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 06 January 2015 | 67 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 16 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 16 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 02 March 2013 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1 A)TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE, RESIDENT IN WELWYN GARDEN CITY AND HATFIELD, OF ISOLATION BY ENABLING THEM TO MEET OTHER PEOPLE WITHIN THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY. B) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE. 2 TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN WELWYN GARDEN CITY, HATFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAM. 3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID.
Area of benefit
WELWYN AND HATFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window