SOMALI RELIEF & REHABILITATION ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Principle activity is to enable Somali refugees and asylum seekers to integrate into the mainstream society.The main principles of SRRO is to enable youth and children to experience educational success by providing guidance in the areas of academic, career, and citizenship development; Our philosophy of education is to teach our children in manner that suits their individual needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
- Somalia
Governance
- 15 March 2007: Standard registration
- 21 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BRIDGING CULTURES UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2008 | 30/11/2009 | 30/11/2010 | 30/11/2011 | 30/11/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.94k | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2012 | 17 December 2013 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2011 | 04 February 2013 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE OF SOMALI ORIGIN IN ENGLAND: 1) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; AND 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED TOTTENHAM, HARINGEY, LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window