THE FRIENDS OF CROSTON HOUSE CHILDREN'S HOME (THAILAND) TRUST

Charity number: 1119087
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSITANCE TO THE RUNNING OF THE HOME. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010

Total income: £1,100
Total expenditure: £760

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 2007: Standard registration
  • 25 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £1.54k £1.77k £1.10k
Total expenditure £820 £1.53k £760
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 06 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 29 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required