BLEAN SCHOOL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE FUNDS TO BENEFIT THE CHILDREN OF BLEAN SCHOOL. ACHIEVED BY THE PURCHASE OF ADDITIONAL PLAYGROUND, CLASSROOM AND TECHNICAL EQUIPMENT. WE ALSO CONTRIBUTE TO THE FUNDING OF EXTRA CURRICULUM ACTIVIITES FOR THE CHILDREN SUCH AS EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 09 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helene Eriksen | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hunt | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hirsh | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
HUGH WILLIAM SAMUELSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.78k | £12.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £192 | £11.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 April 2023 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 21 April 2023 | 598 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 April 2023 | 963 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
BLEAN SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blean Cp School
Whitstable Road
Blean
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT2 9ED
- Phone:
- 01227 471254
- Email:
- ptfa@blean.kent.sch.uk
- Website:
-
bleanprimaryschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window