Trustees FRIENDS OF FOUNDRY LANE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1118072

Charity reporting is up to date (109 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Sophia Andrade | Chair | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nazma Chowdhury | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rose | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Jones | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SEAN TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Cheri Bartlett | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.