KESWICK AND DISTRICT FAIR TRADE CAMPAIGN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Campaign held an Annnual General Meeting on June 6th 2018 at which the Accounts for the year were presented. The secretary gave a report outlining our activities. We held events which highlighted the importance of buying Fairtrade goods for the producers in the developing world. We wrote articles and gave talks on the benefits of Fairtrade.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 27 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Howell | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Mary Mayer Alberti | Trustee | 18 October 2003 |
|
|
||||
MR JOE HUMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £818 | £813 | £813 | £740 | |
|
Total expenditure | £834 | £450 | £599 | £600 | £1.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS IN KESWICK AND DISTRICT OF THE BENEFITS TO POOR THIRD WORLD PRODUCERS OF THE FAIRTRADE LABEL AND BY ENCOURAGING THE PEOPLE IN KESWICK AND DISTRICT TO SELL, SERVE AND BUY GOODS BEARING THE FAIRTRADE LABEL
Area of benefit
KESWICK AND DISTRICT, AND THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-2 Church Row
Threlkeld
KESWICK
CA12 4SJ
- Phone:
- 01768779199
- Website:
-
fairtradekeswick.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window