Financial history GREATER MANCHESTER COMMUNITY TRANSPORT OPERATORS' FORUM

Charity number: 1120427
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £9.66k £38.61k £37.50k £20.92k £10.00k
Total expenditure £35.72k £36.84k £36.84k £12.67k £9.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A