ST AUSTIN'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

FUND RAISING FOR THE BETTER EDUCATION, WELFARE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE CHILDREN OF ST AUSTIN'S SCHOOL

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £12,799
Total expenditure: £7,295

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 February 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fiona Shah Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Claire Speksnijder Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Anne-Louise Bouffard-Roupee Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Debbie Doran Trustee 07 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £16.49k £10.37k £2.68k £2.67k £12.80k
Total expenditure £15.55k £5.96k £1.95k £1.66k £7.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 April 2021 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. AUSTINS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL
RIVERBANK ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L19 9DH
Phone:
01514271800