Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF VICTORIA PARK NURSERY SCHOOL & FAMILY HUB

Charity number: 1120911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required