THORNBURY COMMUNITY BUILDING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote he the inhabitants of Thornbury and surrounding area the proviion of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals. To establish or secure the establisment of as Community building and to maintain and manage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £65,788 from 1 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 February 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Robinson | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN MURIEL GRINDEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.85k | £105.75k | £143.04k | £159.35k | £170.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.70k | £82.37k | £141.29k | £157.29k | £143.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £65.79k | £32.89k | £65.79k | £65.79k | £65.79k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.14k | £70.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THORNBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING EDUCATION AND IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS 3.2 TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY BUILDING (HERE IN AFTER CALLED THE 'CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ['NAME OF NEW COMMITTEE' (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE TRUSTEES) AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THORNBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
TURNBERRIES
BATH ROAD
THORNBURY
BRISTOL
BS35 2BB
- Phone:
- 01454868485
- Email:
- enquiries@turnberries.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window