WANSBECK CENTRE FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a range of support for voluntary and community groups advising on setting up, constitutional matters, funding advice, volunteering support and business planning Our Volunteering service provides support to and for volunteers andvolunteer involving organisations We work at a strategic level in developing partnerships and various initiatives, and deliver a range of direct services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £169,343 from 3 government contract(s) and £106,143 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northumberland
Governance
- 25 May 2007: Standard registration
- NORTHUMBERLAND COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY ACTION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Howarth | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Nevin | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY ASHMORE | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARY HINDMARSH | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|||||
JOSEPH JACKSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £412.45k | £756.70k | £769.45k | £762.86k | £389.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £395.60k | £707.02k | £721.19k | £766.79k | £473.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £260.53k | £523.61k | £520.91k | £536.14k | £169.34k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.40k | £3.38k | £53.38k | £53.38k | £106.14k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £756.58k | £769.38k | £762.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £119 | £66 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £707.02k | £721.19k | £766.79k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.27k | £3.36k | £3.34k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 OCTOBER 2006. as amended on 21 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF WANSBECK AND CASTLE MORPETH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND GENERALLY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF WANSBECK AND CASTLE MORPETH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND GENERALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
WANSBECK CVS
107-109 STATION ROAD
ASHINGTON
NE63 8RS
- Phone:
- 01670858688
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window