THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS THE WONDERWORKER

Charity number: 1118783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Parish of St Nicholas the Wonderworker maintains a full schedule of Orthodox church services, as well as engaging in numerous other activities relevant to parish life, such as a Sunday School and Youth Group, and the oversight of an Orthodox summer camp for children. In August 2021 it was resolved to transfer assets to a new CIO no 1194371. The is still in the course of being achieved

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Poland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • The Orthodox Parish of St Nicholas, Oxford (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS GRAHAM Chair 21 February 2017
The Orthodox Parish of St Nicholas, Oxford
Received: On time
Eric Jansson Trustee 24 March 2019
The Orthodox Parish of St Nicholas, Oxford
Received: On time
Dr Alexey Kostyanovsky Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Tatiana Yuryevna Nosova Cody Trustee 01 January 2017
The Orthodox Parish of St Nicholas, Oxford
Received: On time
MARIANNA COLYER Trustee 24 June 2014
The Orthodox Parish of St Nicholas, Oxford
Received: On time
SIMON JENNINGS MA FCA Trustee 04 December 2011
The Orthodox Parish of St Nicholas, Oxford
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
GIFT OF LIFE
Received: On time
THE OLD BROAD STREET CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE INSTITUTE FOR ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN STUDIES
Received: 131 days late
THE METROPOLITAN KALLISTOS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Anna Platt Trustee 04 December 2011
The Orthodox Parish of St Nicholas, Oxford
Received: On time
FRANCES JENNINGS Trustee 04 December 2011
None on record
Fr Stephen Tobias Ralph Platt Trustee 01 January 2008
FRIENDS OF MOUNT ATHOS
Received: On time
THE ANGLICAN AND EASTERN CHURCHES ASSOCIATION (CIO)
Received: On time
MAEVE HENRY Trustee 01 January 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £206.52k £148.65k £465.96k £186.06k £0
Total expenditure £39.88k £41.11k £52.82k £82.44k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 December 2022 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 19 December 2022 172 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 November 2021 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 November 2021 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 October 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 October 2020 121 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Warwick Street
OXFORD
OX4 1SX
Phone:
07860493718