Accounts and annual returns PERRY HALL PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1122857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window