WILLENHALL SCHOOL OF HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with disadvantaged people and groups providing support through food provision, self-development opportunities, counselling, advocacy, basic and social skills training, signposting to other agencies, practical skills training and voluntary work experience. This is especially needed in this area of deprivation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 30 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paulette Williams-Jones | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROGER GEORGE MAYNARD | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £552 | £1.32k | £2.44k | £2.44k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 161 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 161 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 527 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 527 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 892 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 892 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 04 December 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 December 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES 17 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE BLACK COUNTRY:- 3.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 3.2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS; 3.3 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND 3.5 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hope House
2 Wilkes Street
WILLENHALL
West Midlands
WV13 2BS
- Phone:
- 07957815876
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window