THE NEWELL CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings, trips and facilities for the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Soline Jerram | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Colville | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Stevens | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HUGH SHIPSTONE SHIPPAM JP DL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.79k | £66.99k | £40.92k | £48.71k | £53.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.66k | £55.20k | £62.82k | £67.37k | £73.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.82k | £18.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 NOVEMBER 2006, AS AMENDED 8 JANUARY 2008 AND 10 DECEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT WITHIN THE CITY OF CHICHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
BASSIL SHIPPAM CENTRE
TOZER WAY
CHICHESTER
PO19 7LG
- Phone:
- 01243782245
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window