THE FAIRFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make bequests to Charities & charitable work in order to relieve sicknesss suffering & poverty to promote education and to promote the christian religion and to undertake any other exclusively charitable purposes beneficial to the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ABERNETHIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ABIGAIL ABERNETHIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.00k | £120.00k | £120.00k | £110.00k | £110.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.27k | £116.17k | £116.76k | £118.37k | £109.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
ARE TO MAKE BEQUESTS TO CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE WORK IN ORDER TO RELIEVE SICKNESS SUFFERING AND POVERTY, TO PROMOTE EDUCATION, TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Granville House
Unit E The Heights Business Park
Ibstone Road
Stokenchurch
HIGH WYC
- Phone:
- 01895276724
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window