LONDON TAGALOG CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding and arranging meetings for public religious worship. Teaching of the Bible and gospel of Christ at these public meetings. Teaching and preaching the gospel to the public within the congregation area. Distribution of Bibles and other religious literature to the public in the congregation area. Ministerial and pastoral assistance to members of the congregation and the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 March 2007: Standard registration
- 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
- LONDON, TAGALOG CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.66k | £3.39k | £4.49k | £4.11k | £4.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.33k | £2.75k | £3.98k | £4.03k | £4.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 22/12/2014
Charitable objects
THE PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOUNDED ON THE HOLY BIBLE, INCLUDING THE PREACHING OF THE GOOD NEWS OF GOD'S KINGDOM BY JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE CONGREGATION AREA AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS FOR PUBLIC CHRISTIAN WORSHIP
Area of benefit
HAMMERSMITH / LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window