NEW INITIATIVES YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR PROGRAMMES ARE JOURNEYS OF SELF-DISCOVERY WHERE YOUNG PEOPLE ARE GUIDED THROUGH CHALLENGING PROCESSES THAT PREPARE THEM TO MOVE FROM CHILDHOOD TO BECOME YOUNG ADULTS. WE DELIVER FOUR PROGRAMME ELEMENTS (EARTH, FIRE, WATER AND AIR). THESE ARE AWARENESS-RAISING WORKSHOPS, ADRENALINE-PUMPING ADVENTURES AND TESTS OF CHARACTER THAT LEAD TO A COMMUNITY GRADUATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £124,750 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AYOOLA TIYA RAET KABARA- CLARKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL REID | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOLLY BLASSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELLA JESS-REID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.61k | £480 | £96.56k | £128.01k | £140.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.94k | £8.76k | £68.27k | £149.00k | £156.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £124.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 May 2025 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 May 2025 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2024 | 536 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 2 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS (A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN ORIGIN LIVING IN LAMBETH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN ORIGIN LIVING IN LONDON ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY REGARDING THEIR CULTURE AND HERITAGE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL POTENTIAL THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
LONDON, ESPECIALLY LAMBETH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Impact Brixton
17a Electric Lane
Brixton
London
SW9 8LA
- Phone:
- 020 7127 6803
- Email:
- info@ritesofpassage.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window