CUCKMERE COMMUNITY BUS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE A COMMUNITY BUS AND A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £174,820 from 4 government contract(s) and £17,380 from 8 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 08 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL ANNE SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Wayne Evenden | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Warren | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Brian Price | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MONTAGUE AYRES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.95k | £220.74k | £238.87k | £266.78k | £339.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.01k | £187.98k | £237.88k | £257.26k | £329.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.23k | £12.59k | £13.63k | N/A | £174.82k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.50k | £28.33k | £19.49k | N/A | £17.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY BUS AND A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE, INCLUDING PRIVATE HIRE, FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF EAST AND WEST SUSSEX AND THE CITY OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX, WEST SUSSEX, BRIGHTON AND HOVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Alexandra Close
SEAFORD
East Sussex
BN25 2XA
- Phone:
- 01323894988
- Email:
- paul@cuckmerebuses.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window