Financial history WASTE ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION RESEARCH TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1118468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.22k £5.78k £13.95k £49.02k £16.42k
Total expenditure £63.87k £82.03k £64.80k £66.95k £8.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A