UPPER TEESDALE AGRICULTURAL SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of advice and education, support and mentoring to the community in the area of operation. Including the provision of a drop-in facility for young people and encouraging and supporting outside organisations and outreach working
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £20,143 from 5 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
87 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
Governance
- 17 July 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Bernard McGarry | Chair | 03 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Robert Danby | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Martin Roger Peat | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Colling | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Markwick | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip William Lamb | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Lumb | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Simpson | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carl Stephenson | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|||||
RICHARD IAN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312.60k | £377.85k | £381.92k | £401.73k | £395.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.45k | £329.81k | £319.05k | £364.40k | £399.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £15.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £44.14k | £43.17k | £85.19k | £78.69k | £20.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
''TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE RURAL AREA OF UPPER TEESDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.''
Area of benefit
UPPER TEESDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9-11 CHAPEL ROW
MIDDLETON-IN-TEESDALE
BARNARD CASTLE
CO DURHAM
DL12 0SN
- Phone:
- 01833641010
- Email:
- info@utass.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window