SCOOT-A-LONG
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO TAKE DISABLED PEOPLE OUT ON DAY TRIPS USING OUR EQUIPMENT, THESE ARE PEOPLE WHO ARE NORMALLY HOUSE BOUND. WE TAKE THEM OUT ONTO THE MOORS AND PLACES NOT NORMALLY ACCESSABLE ON MOBILITY SCOOTERS, OUR SCOOTERS ARE ALL TERRAIN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 June 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 13 June 2007: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 July 2011: Re-registered
- 25 September 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/06/2011 | 04/06/2012 | 04/06/2013 | 04/06/2014 | 04/06/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.43k | £11.68k | £21.95k | £11.26k | £7.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.84k | £11.88k | £18.74k | £13.76k | £7.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2015 | 22 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2014 | 21 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MOBILITY EQUIPMENT (INCLUDING ACCESSORIES FOR USE WITH AND ESSENTIAL FOR THE OPERATION OF SUCH EQUIPMENT) NOT PROVIDED BY STATUTORY PROVIDERS INCLUDING THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE AND CENTRAL AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT FOR USE BY ADULTS AND CHILDREN WITH PERMANENT OR TEMPORARY MOBILITY PROBLEMS ON A LOAN OR HIRE BASIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE PLYMOUTH, DEVON AND CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window