TAILOR FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide financial support for various projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
- India
- Pakistan
Governance
- 07 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL SAMAD TAILOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
YAKUB TAILOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOONAF TAILOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IQBAL TAILOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AYUB TAILOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAFIQ AHMED TAILOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CIRAJ TAILOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALIM TAILOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ILYAS TAILOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.85k | £7.15k | £9.90k | £12.71k | £15.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53k | £5.36k | £11.87k | £10.21k | £15.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 11 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
(I) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS IN NEED BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES. (II) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE THIRD WORLD BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. (III) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 FULWOOD HALL LANE
FULWOOD
PRESTON
PR2 8DA
- Phone:
- 01772704080
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window