Trustees MINCHINHAMPTON SCHOOL PTA
Charity Number: 1118308

Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Marney | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Wood | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Banks | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Austin | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Bryan | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Minto | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Clarke | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Robertson | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Sawyer | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS MOSS | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.