Register of Charities - The Charity Commission LLANDOVERY COLLEGE (THOMAS PHILLIPS FOUNDATION) TRUST
Charity number: 1149946-1
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 21 AUG 2006
11 OCT 2006
14 JUL 2011
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 JUL 2012
AS AMENDED ON 13 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL IN OR NEAR LLANDOVERY AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
2) RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION MUST BE GIVEN IN THE COLLEGE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH IN WALES UNDER REGULATIONS MADE BY THE TRUSTEE.
3) INSTRUCTION IN THE WELSH LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND ARTS MUST ALSO BE GIVEN IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LLANDOVERY
Registration history
- 19 February 2007: Standard registration
Other names
- LLANDOVERY COLLEGE (THOMAS PHILLIPS FOUNDATION) (Previous name)
- LLANDOVERY COLLEGE (THOMAS PHILLIPS) TRUST (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.