Financial history THE TREE OF LIFE FOR ANIMALS LIMITED

Charity number: 1120789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £159.09k £166.13k £194.24k £212.26k £217.50k
Total expenditure £163.37k £158.71k £163.34k £179.09k £167.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A