SRI GURU RAVIDASS SABHA AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sri Guru Ravidass Sabha and Community Centre Bedford is a multicultural organisation, serving everyone regardless of race, colour, creed, gender or ability. We provide services ranging from IT ESOL courses to Welfare Benefits advice surgery. The centre is open 24 hours a day and 7 days a week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

24 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
Governance
- 08 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARSEM PAUL | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|||||
SADA RAM BHATTI | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RAM | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SATPAL PAUL | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
RAM PARKASH BANGERH | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHARAN SINGH | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHINDER RAM SANDHU | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
HAZARA RAM BAINS | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SODI RAM MAHI | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
HARMESH BANGERH | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SOHAN SINGH JHALLI | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
RAM SARAN SUMAN | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
BALDEV RAJ NIGHAH | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHAMAN LAL | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
TARSEM BANGERH | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SATVEER BADHAN | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SURINDER PAUL | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PREM CHAND BASRA | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAN SINGH BAINS | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MEHAR CHAND GHERA | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHAIN RAM | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
GURMEL SINGH CHAMBER | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
GURCHAIN SUNYARA | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
OM PARKASH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.79k | £66.95k | £201.68k | £320.68k | £282.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.00k | £49.55k | £134.47k | £768.62k | £308.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION, DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2002, AS AMENDED 8 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
2.1) TO ADVANCE AND SPREAD RAVIDASSIA PRINCIPLES BY: 1) TO ADVANCE THE RAVIDASSIA RELIGION IN BEDFORDSHIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, ORGANISING PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF EVENT AND RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS OF SIGNIFICANT IMPORTANCE RELATING TO THE LIFE AND TEACHINGS OF SRI GURU RAVIDASS JI. PRODUCE AND/OR DISTRIBUTE LITERATURE ON THE RAVIDASSIA FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE RAVIDASSIA RELIGION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE AND TEACHINGS OF SRI GURU RAVIDASSIA JI. 3) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATION IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR REACTION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 4) TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTERS IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID. 5) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS IN THE FIELDS OF EDUCATION, SPORTS AND ARTS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS. 6) TO MAINTAIN GOOD WORKING RELATIONSHIP WITH SRI GURU RAVIDASS SABHA UK AND ACCEPT IT AS SUPREME BODY OF RAVIDASSIA ORGANISATIONS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE RAVIDASSIA PRINCIPALS OF EQUALITY, JUSTICE, FAIRNESS, CHARITY, TOLERANCE AND UNDERSTANDING. 7) TO DIRECT THE YOUNGER GENERATION TO UNDERSTAND THE CUSTOMS AND TRADITIONS OF THE RAVIDASSIA COMMUNITY. 8) TO ASSOCIATE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND PARTICIPATE IN ACTIVITIES, WHOSE AIMS, OBJECTIVES AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES ARE SIMILAR TO THOSE DEFINED IN THIS CONSTITUTION AND ARE NOT CONTRADICTORY IN ANY WAY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE COMMUNITY CENTRE(S) AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sri Guru Ravidass Bhawan &
Community Centre
Guru Ravidass Lane
Bedford
BEDFORDSHIRE
MK40 1ED
- Phone:
- 07980814301
- Email:
- gururavidass@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window