DIGITAL PIPELINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Digital Pipeline helps alleviate poverty by providing access to computer equipment for the poorest schools and projects in the UK and the developing world. As a consequence we also promote conservation, protection & improvement of the environment through the re-use of ICT equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 April 2007: Standard registration
- 04 July 2013: Funds received from 1107676 COMPUTERS 4 AFRICA
- Computers 4 Charity, Caring for Climate and Community (Working name)
- COMPUTERS 4 AFRICA (Previous name)
- COMPUTERS 4 CHARITY - INCORPORATING COMPUTERS 4 AFRICA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Thompson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||
Kenneth Rich | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||
Mark Lawrence | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £693.58k | £231.11k | £217.51k | £406.47k | £445.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £609.06k | £219.50k | £179.47k | £396.66k | £461.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.83k | £17.57k | £13.06k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £75.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £618.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £594.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £41.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO: A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY, TO COMPUTERS AND OTHER HARDWARE AND TO SOFTWARE ("ICT") AND TO RELATED ICT EDUCATION AND TRAINING MATERIALS AND ICT MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT TO THE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH EQUIPMENT IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES (AS DEFINED BY THE UNITED NATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME) INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE IN AFRICA; B) PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY FACILITATING THE RE-USE OF ICT EQUIPMENT; C) RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO ICT, TO ICT EDUCATION AND TRAINING MATERIALS AND ICT MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT TO THE POOR IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES (AS DEFINED BY THE UNITED NATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME) INCLUDING BY NOT LIMITED TO THOSE IN AFRICA; D) ADVANCE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED AS BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ENGLISH LAW FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit A6 (Unit 4)
Powerhub Business Centre
St. Peters Street
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME16 0ST
- Phone:
- 03000112233
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window