DOGWATCH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising activities for animal welfare and dog rescue. Re-homing dogs .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Devon
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
- Spain
Governance
- 17 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE MARION BOARDMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Iain Mitchell | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Pyle | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Lee | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.62k | £9.77k | £4.20k | £8.74k | £11.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.11k | £10.16k | £5.66k | £7.94k | £12.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS WHO ARE IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AREA WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CARE AND TREATMENT AND ALSO BY HELPING TO FIND THEM NEW HOMES AND 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONCERNING THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF DOGS
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eden Villa
Exminster
EXETER
EX6 8DB
- Phone:
- 07932155843
- Email:
- dogwatchuk@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window