NEWBURY PARK MASJID


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Newbury Park Masjid is the advancement of Islam amongst the people living in the London borough of Redbridge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Redbridge
Governance
- 13 March 2007: Standard registration
- NEWBURY PARK ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mahbub Hussain | Chair | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ATIQUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Abdul Munayem | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shahid Ahmed | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chowdhury Mohammed Abu Taraque | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Abul Kalam | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Baha Uddin | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Golam Rafique | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Abdul Hannan | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL HANAN BHUIYAN | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.33k | £168.18k | £237.37k | £224.54k | £203.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.01k | £106.08k | £90.63k | £108.25k | £140.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEB 2006 AS AMENDED ON 04 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE OF THE NEWBURY PARK ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAM AMONGST THE PEOPLE LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 Oaks Lane
ILFORD
IG2 7PY
- Phone:
- 07941481272
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window