GREENWICH STARTING BLOCKS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are: To advance for the public benefit the education of Young Persons in all aspects of Olympic Sports; To advance, promote and preserve physical health and fitness for the public benefit by assessing Young Persons to participate in Olympic Sports and To improve the conditions of life for Disabled Persons by assisting them to participate in Olympic Sports
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Greenwich
Governance
- 15 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Anderson | Chair | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert McCurry | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julian Bernard Alexander Evans | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Bird | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|||||
BARBARA BARWICK | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES PATRICK MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.50k | £51.67k | £70.10k | £382 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.18k | £46.68k | £76.02k | £12.48k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/07/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS IN ALL ASPECTS OF OLYMPIC SPORTS; 2) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND PRESERVE PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSISTING YOUNG PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN OLYMPIC SPORTS; 3) TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR DISABLED PERSONS BY ASSISTING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN OLYMPIC SPORTS; AND 4) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH
THE WOOLWICH CENTRE
35 WELLINGTON STREET
LONDON
SE186HQ
- Phone:
- 02089212179
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window