Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF MOSS PARK INFANT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1122045
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2015 22 August 2016 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 30 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 02 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required