ST THOMAS MAR THOMA CHURCH, BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the faith, doctrine and practices of the parent church namely ' Mar Thoma Church' for the benefit of its members and the public and to do all charitable work allowed under the law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- Devon
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jaffey Chacko Treasurer | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saji John Secretary | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vineeth P Kunju GSC PG Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jinie Sam SunSch Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Saji John YouFel Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Niravathu Vice Pres. | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annie Cherian SevSan Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kolekulangara Vilayil oommen John Mandalam | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEX PRASAD ABRAHAM Lay Leader | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
BIJU PALACKAMANNIL ABRAHAM BATH PGRep | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHNSON CHACKO PUTHENVEETTIL TP PG Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANU SAMUEL Assembly | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.99k | £126.58k | £217.50k | £343.64k | £197.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.43k | £100.01k | £97.81k | £147.79k | £157.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 28 OCTOBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE FAITH, DOCTRINE AND PRACTICES OF THE PARENT CHURCH NAMELY "MAR THOMA CHURCH" FOR THE BENEFIT OF ITS MEMBERS, AND THE PUBLIC AND TO DO ALL CHARITABLE WORK ALLOWED UNDER THE LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Sherbourne Avenue
Bradley Stoke
BRISTOL
BS32 8BB
- Phone:
- 01179834521
- Email:
- bristolmtc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window