INTERNATIONAL OBESITY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 August 2007: Standard registration
- 13 January 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 6TH NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 23RD APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOO HEALTH AND RELIEVE THOSE SUFFERING FROM MEDICAL CONDITIONS RELATED TO OBESITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY A ASSISTING THE CLINICALLY OBESE IN PREVENTING AND RELIEVING MEDICAL CONDITIONS RELATED TO OBESITY; B ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON THE CAUSES AND HARMFUL EFFECTS OF OBESITY AND RECOGNITION OF OBESITY AS A MEDICAL CONDITION; C CONDUCTING OR PROMOTING OR ENCOURAGING RESEARCH OR TRAINING OF ANY PERSON CONNECTED WITH THE CARE, WELFARE,TREATMENT AND SUPPORT OF THOSE SUFFERING OBESITY AND THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window