INDI PROJECT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assists disadvantaged children out of poverty by establishing schools and providing ongoing education and welfare. Promotes awareness of the International issues of poverty in Uk schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kenya
Governance
- 08 January 2008: Standard registration
- 20 December 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2011 | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.48k | £6.89k | £4.74k | £6.24k | £6.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.17k | £13.68k | £10.10k | £9.26k | £9.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 05 November 2016 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 18 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
4.1 TO ESTABLISH AND ASSIST WITH THE MANAGEMENT AND RUNNING OF THE SCHOOL AND OTHER SIMILAR SCHOOLS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND PROVISION OF THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVANCEMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN TIMBONI, KENYA, AFRICA, AND SUCH OTHER LOCATIONS IN KENYA; 4.2 TO PROVIDE BURSARIES, SPONSORSHIPS, GRANTS AND OTHER ONGOING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO MEET OR ASSIST WITH MEETING THE FINANCIAL COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THE EDUCATION, TRAINING OR ADVANCEMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN KENYA, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL, WISHING TO ADVANCE TO FURTHER EDUCATION WHETHER SUCH FURTHER EDUCATION IS IN TIMBONI OR ELSEWHERE IN KENYA; 4.3 TO PROVIDE FOR AND ASSIST WITH ANCILLARY BENEFITS IN RELATION TO THE PROVISION OF ADVANCEMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND PROVISION OF EDUCATION TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN KENYA INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SERVICES AND TREATMENT, NUTRITION AND NUTRITION SERVICES AND ACCESS TO ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN ACCESSING SUCH MEDICAL AND NUTRITIONAL SERVICES; 4.4 TO PREPARE, PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION RELATING TO THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN KENYA; 4.5 TO PROMOTE THE USE OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL AND ELSEWHERE IN KENYA INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE USE OF VIDEO, INTERNET AND SATELLITE DELIVERY TECHNOLOGY AND APPLICATIONS; 4.6 TO SUPPORT AND CO-OPERATE WITH EXISTING CHARITIES, REGISTERED IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND ABROAD, WHOSE OBJECTS RELATE TO PROVIDING EDUCATION TO SCHOOL CHILDREN IN KENYA; 4.7 TO FACILITATE CO-OPERATION OF PROFESSIONALS ENLISTED FOR THE PURPOSE OF FURTHERING THE FOREGOING OBJECTS; AND 4.8 TO PROMOTE THE CO-OPERATION OF EXISTING CHARITIES, COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANIES, SCHOOLS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE DESIROUS OF FURTHERING THE FOREGOING OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window